Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 11/04/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/15/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 12/16/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/16/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/27/2012