Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/23/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/23/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/06/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/14/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/18/2012