Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/18/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/29/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/02/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/08/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/08/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/11/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/27/2012