Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/04/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/30/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/30/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/30/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/19/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/21/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/21/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/28/2012