Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/21/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/22/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/03/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/03/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 10/05/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/11/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/12/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/15/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/16/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/18/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/29/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/29/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/29/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/30/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 12/07/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/07/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/07/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/13/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/20/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 01/18/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/27/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/02/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/03/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/05/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/17/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/17/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/18/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2012