Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/23/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/23/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/23/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/03/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/03/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/03/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/04/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/12/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/12/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/12/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/12/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/12/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/12/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/24/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/24/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/04/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/04/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/25/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/07/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/27/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/16/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/17/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/29/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/27/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 11/27/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/27/2012