Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/04/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/05/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/12/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/19/2012