Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/29/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/31/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/15/2011