Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/13/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/13/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 10/13/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/13/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 10/13/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 10/13/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/13/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/13/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/13/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/13/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 10/13/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/13/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/13/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/13/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 10/13/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/13/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 10/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/13/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 10/13/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/25/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/25/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/18/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/18/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/18/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/16/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 12/20/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/26/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/24/2012