Committees: H.R.3 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/20/2011 Referral
03/17/2011 Reporting H. Rept. 112-38
03/03/2011 Markup
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution02/04/2011 Referral
02/28/2011 Discharged
02/08/2011 Hearing
House Energy and Commerce01/20/2011 Referral
04/07/2011 Discharged
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/01/2011 Referral
House Ways and Means01/20/2011 Referral
04/07/2011 Discharged