Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/08/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/08/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/15/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/03/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/08/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/06/2011