Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/24/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 01/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/24/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/15/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/08/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/08/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/10/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/07/2011