Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/26/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/26/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/29/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/11/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/11/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/11/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/11/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 10/31/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/31/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/15/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/05/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/19/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/19/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/16/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/07/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/24/2012