Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/29/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/04/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/06/2011