Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/05/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/06/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 11/04/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew