Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 11/02/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 11/02/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/02/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/02/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/02/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/03/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/04/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/15/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/18/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew