Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/25/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/31/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/18/2011