Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/03/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/11/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/27/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/11/2012