Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/22/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/22/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/04/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/05/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/09/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/09/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/29/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/11/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/22/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/05/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/07/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/07/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/21/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/10/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/10/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/20/2012