There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Retired Pay Restoration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to permit additional retired members of the Armed Forces who have a service-connected disability to receive both disability compensation from the Department of Veterans Affairs for their disability and either retired pay by reason of their years of military service or Combat-Related Special Compensation and to eliminate the phase-in period under current law with respect to such concurrent receipt.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/18/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/25/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/04/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/18/2011Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2011Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/25/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/25/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/09/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/09/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/09/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/09/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/10/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/10/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/10/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/10/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/11/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/11/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/15/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/17/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/01/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/01/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/11/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/16/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/29/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/31/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/06/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/02/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/02/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/12/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/18/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/25/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/20/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 10/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/17/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 12/16/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/15/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/28/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/05/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/06/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/28/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 04/16/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/12/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/24/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/31/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/01/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/20/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/26/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/17/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/18/2011 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/04/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs01/18/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs02/25/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.303. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/18/2011)

Retired Pay Restoration Act - Expresses the sense of Congress that military retired pay should not be reduced because a military retiree is also eligible for veterans' disability compensation awarded for a service-connected disability.

Allows the receipt of both military retired pay and veterans' disability compensation with respect to any service-connected disability (under current law, only a disability rated at 50% or more). Repeals provisions phasing in the full concurrent receipt of such pay through December 31, 2013.

Makes eligible for the full concurrent receipt of both veterans' disability compensation and either military retired pay or combat-related special pay those individuals who were retired or separated from military service due to a service-connected disability.