Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/03/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/13/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/26/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/02/2012