Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/06/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/24/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/31/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/25/2012