Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/03/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/03/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/06/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/06/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/06/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 10/06/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/11/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/24/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/24/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/24/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/03/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 11/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/14/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 11/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/17/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/20/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/24/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/29/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012