Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 09/23/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/30/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/22/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/22/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/21/2012