Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/27/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/27/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/27/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/20/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/21/2012