Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/06/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/06/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/12/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 10/12/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/13/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/24/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/24/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/27/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/27/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/27/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/01/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/02/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/02/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/02/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/03/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/14/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/14/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/14/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/29/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/12/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 12/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/17/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/17/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/17/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/17/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/17/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/29/2012