Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/11/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/14/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/15/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/06/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/06/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/06/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/07/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/13/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/16/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/27/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/15/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/30/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/29/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/10/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/10/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/18/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/02/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/10/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/02/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/16/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2012