Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/25/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/25/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/25/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/16/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/14/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/14/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/20/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/18/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/30/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/08/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/26/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/29/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/24/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/14/2012