Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/23/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/03/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/03/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/03/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/04/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/05/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/06/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/06/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/11/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/12/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/13/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/14/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 10/18/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/21/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/21/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 10/21/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/21/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/21/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/27/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/31/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/31/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/02/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/02/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/02/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/04/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/04/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/10/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/10/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/10/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/10/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/10/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/14/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/15/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/17/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/18/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/18/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/29/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/29/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/29/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/29/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/02/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/06/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/06/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/07/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/08/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/13/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/13/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/17/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/24/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 01/24/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/24/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/31/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/01/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/03/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/09/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/14/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/14/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/16/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/21/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/28/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 02/28/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/01/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/06/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/06/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/07/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/13/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/13/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/13/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/19/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/19/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/22/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/24/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/07/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/07/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/06/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/12/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/19/2012