Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/22/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/23/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/04/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/26/2011