Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/23/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/23/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/23/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/03/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/04/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/04/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/04/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/18/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/18/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/26/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 04/27/2012