Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 10/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/03/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/03/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/13/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/02/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/02/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/02/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/02/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/13/2012