Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/11/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/11/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/13/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/24/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/24/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/24/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/24/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/18/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/18/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/18/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/18/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/18/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/18/2011