Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/21/2011 Became Public Law No: 112-43.
10/21/2011 Signed by President.
10/13/2011 Presented to President.
10/12/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 77 - 22. Record Vote Number: 162.
10/12/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 300 - 129 (Roll no. 782).(text: CR 10/11/2011 H6745-6754)
10/06/2011 Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 112-238.
10/03/2011 Introduced in House