There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Large Capacity Ammunition Feeding Device Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the transfer or possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/18/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/07/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/18/2011Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (138)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/18/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/18/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/19/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/19/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 01/19/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/20/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/20/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/20/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/20/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/24/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/24/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/24/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/24/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/24/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/24/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/10/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/10/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/10/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/10/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/10/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/10/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/10/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/15/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/15/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/17/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/17/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/17/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/18/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/18/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/29/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/30/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/03/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/24/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/24/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/18/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/18/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/18/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/18/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/18/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/18/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/18/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/18/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/20/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/20/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/20/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/20/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/20/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/20/2012
Rep. Curson, David Alan [D-MI-11] 12/20/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/20/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/20/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/18/2011 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security02/07/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.308. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/18/2011)

Large Capacity Ammunition Feeding Device Act - Amends the Brady Handgun Violence Prevention Act to prohibit: (1) the transfer or possession of a large capacity ammunition feeding device, except for its lawful possession within the United States on or before the date of this Act's enactment; and (2) the importation or bringing into the United States of such a device.

Sets forth exceptions to such ban.

Sets penalties for violations.

Requires a large capacity ammunition feeding device manufactured after this Act's enactment to be identified by a serial number that clearly shows that the device was manufactured after enactment and such other identification as the Attorney General may prescribe.