Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
10/21/2011 Became Public Law No: 112-41.
10/21/2011 Signed by President.
10/13/2011 Presented to President.
10/12/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 83 - 15. Record Vote Number: 161.
10/12/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 278 - 151 (Roll no. 783).(text: CR 10/11/2011 H6758-6767)
10/06/2011 Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 112-239.
10/03/2011 Introduced in House