Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 10/05/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/06/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/12/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 10/12/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/14/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/24/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/27/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/27/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/27/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/27/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/27/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/02/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/02/2011