Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 10/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/22/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/15/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 05/31/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/10/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/10/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/28/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/13/2012