There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Breast Density and Mammography Reporting Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require that every mammography summary delivered to a patient after a mammography examination, as required by section 354 of the Public Health Service Act (commonly referred to as the "Mammography Quality Standards Act of 1992"), contain information regarding the patient's breast density and language communicating that individuals with more dense breasts may benefit from supplemental screening tests, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/05/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
10/07/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/05/2011Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/05/2011Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1778-1779)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/05/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 10/14/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/26/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/27/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/20/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/31/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/21/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/10/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/25/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/31/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/01/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/12/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/15/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/27/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 11/27/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/27/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/12/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/12/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/18/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/18/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/18/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/05/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/07/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3102.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3102. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/05/2011)

Breast Density and Mammography Reporting Act of 2011 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require mammography facilities to include information regarding the patient's individual measure of breast density in both the written report of the results of a mammography examination provided to the patient's physician and the summary of that written report given to patients. Requires the summary to: (1) convey the patient's risk of developing breast cancer associated with below, above, and average levels of breast density; and (2) include language communicating that individuals with more dense breasts may benefit from supplemental screening tests and should talk with their physicians about any questions or concerns regarding the summary.