Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/26/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/30/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/08/2012