Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 10/06/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/02/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/02/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/03/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/17/2011