Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/07/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/13/2012