Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/11/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 10/11/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/11/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/14/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/26/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/01/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/01/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/02/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/29/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/29/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/29/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/28/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/19/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/20/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/21/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/22/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/28/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/28/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/18/2012