Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/11/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/11/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/14/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/14/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/27/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/27/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/27/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/27/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/27/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/27/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/27/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/04/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/16/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/01/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/06/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/13/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/02/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/06/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/06/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/06/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/06/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/06/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/06/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/29/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/18/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/01/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 08/02/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/14/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/13/2012