Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/25/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/27/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/02/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/04/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/17/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/16/2012