There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FUELS Act
Farmers Undertake Environmental Land Stewardship Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

FUELS Act
Farmers Undertake Environmental Land Stewardship Act

Short Titles as Introduced

FUELS Act
Farmers Undertake Environmental Land Stewardship Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to change the Spill Prevention, Control, and Countermeasure rule with respect to certain farms.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/01/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5608)
08/01/2012Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-643.
10/12/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
08/02/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
08/01/2012-7:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/01/2012-7:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5608)
08/01/2012-7:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3158.
08/01/2012-7:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5608-5609)
08/01/2012-7:41pmHouseMr. Crawford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/01/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 462.
08/01/2012HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-643.
07/26/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/26/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/26/2012HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
10/14/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
10/12/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
10/12/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/10/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/10/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/10/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 11/16/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/01/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/24/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/24/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/26/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/31/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/31/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/12/2011 Referred to
07/26/2012 Markup by
08/01/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-643
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment10/14/2011 Referred to
07/26/2012 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works08/02/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3158. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/01/2012)

Farmers Undertake Environmental Land Stewardship Act or the FUELS Act - Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), in implementing the Spill Prevention, Control, and Countermeasure rule with respect to any farm, to require certification of compliance with such rule by: (1) a professional engineer for a farm with an individual tank with an aboveground storage capacity greater than 10,000 gallons, an aggregate aboveground storage capacity of at least 42,000 gallons, or a history that includes a spill; or (2) the owner or operator of the farm (via self-certification) for a farm with an aggregate aboveground storage capacity greater than 10,000 gallons but less than 42,000 gallons and no history of spills. Exempts from all requirements of such rule any farm with an aggregate aboveground storage capacity of at least 10,000 gallons and no history of spills.

Excludes all containers on separate parcels that have a capacity that is less than 1,320 gallons from the aggregate aboveground storage capacity of a farm.