Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/25/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/25/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/29/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/06/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/06/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/20/2012