Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/12/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/07/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/28/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 02/28/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/28/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 04/24/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/24/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/07/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/16/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/16/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/17/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/06/2012