Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/27/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/04/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/16/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/16/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/16/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/16/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/17/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/17/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/17/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/29/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/29/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/01/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/01/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/01/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/12/2012