Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/02/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/04/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 12/06/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/14/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/09/2012